Global Patent Index - EP 0971185 A1

EP 0971185 A1 2000-01-12 - Method and device for producing snow

Title (en)

Method and device for producing snow

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Schnee

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour produire de la neige

Publication

EP 0971185 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202598 A

Priority

BE 9800525 A

Abstract (en)

Method and device for producing snow (4) which consists of forming ice (2) on a wall (9) provided with cooling means (10,11,12) and water supply means (13,14,15,16), removing this ice (2) by a scraper (17) and subsequently transforming this ice (2) into snow (4) by two mutually cooperating crushing and/or breaking rollers (27,28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25C 3/04; F25C 1/14; F25C 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25C 1/14 (2006.01); F25C 3/04 (2006.01); F25C 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 3/04 (2013.01); F25C 1/145 (2013.01); F25C 5/046 (2013.01); F25C 2303/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971185 A1 20000112; BE 1012067 A3 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021031

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI