Global patent index - EP 0971191 A2

EP 0971191 A2 2000-01-12 - Process and apparatus for heating goods by a heated gas

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for heating goods by a heated gas

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Behandeln von Gütern mittels eines erwärmten Gases

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour traiter des objets par un gaz chauffé

Publication

EP 0971191 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111709 A

Priority

  • DE 19830664 A
  • DE 19918102 A

Abstract (en)

To treat a material with a heated gas, the heated gas is mixed with an added gas at the point inlet. Part of the heated gas is returned as the added gas for mixing, from the zone behind the fan blower in the gas flow direction. The mixing of the heated and the added gas is spread vertically after the point inlet. The cooler gas is drawn wholly from the recirculating air. The heated gas is steam or the burner gas is at a gas or oil burner. Part of the drying air as a mixing gas is taken from the pressure chamber back into the suction chamber, to be mixed with the heated gas to be fed to the recirculating air. The warmed gas is 160-220 degrees C, the cooler gas is 80-150 degrees C and the heated gas is 2000 degrees C. The volume of the mixing gas is set to give a temperature of the mixture of heated and added gases of 300-500 degrees C (350-450 degrees C). The warmed gas fed back for mixing comprises 7-25% (10-20%) of the heated gas. An Independent claim is also included for an assembly with a mixing station (56,57) near the point inlet (53) for the heated gas. A mixing gas feed channel connects the pressure side of the fan (55) with the mixing station (56,57).

Abstract (de)

Bei bekannten Vorrichtungen, z.B. Trocknern mit Punktbrennern tritt das Problem auf, daß erhitztes Gas, d.h. Brennergas, sich unvollständig mit zu erwärmenden, kühleren Gas mischt, was zu einer ungleichmäßigen Temperatur des erwärmten Gases, d.h. der Trocknungsluft, führt Es soll ein Verfahren und eine entsprechende Vorrichtung entwickelt werden, bei dem Trocknungsluft homogener Temperatur erzeugt wird. Dies wird erreicht, indem ein Teil der Trocknungsluft als Zumischgas zurückgeführt und mit dem Brennergas gemischt wird. Die Mischung aus Brennergas und Trocknungsluft läßt sich leichter mit dem kühleren Gas zu Trocknungsluft homogener Temperatur mischen als reines, heißes Brennergas. Trockner <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 23/02 (2006.01); F23D 14/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971191 A2 20000112; EP 0971191 A3 20011212; EP 0971191 B1 20050209; AT 289051 T 20050215; KR 100413867 B1 20040107; KR 20000011611 A 20000225; PT 971191 E 20050630

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-06-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060617

2007-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-12-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060617

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-06-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050607

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59911577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050317

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB IT PT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI