Global Patent Index - EP 0971194 A2

EP 0971194 A2 2000-01-12 - Static heat exchanger

Title (en)

Static heat exchanger

Title (de)

Stehender Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur statique

Publication

EP 0971194 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113248 A

Priority

DE 29812232 U

Abstract (en)

A spiral sloping coil (13) fills the space (15) between the inner and outer heat exchanger and/or a sloping coil (14) is wound onto the outer heat exchanger in the outer part (16) and occupies the space (16) between the outer heat exchanger and housing-wall.

Abstract (de)

Stehender Wärmetauscher für die Heißwasserbereitung für Hochdruckreiniger, wobei in einem zylinderförmigen Gehäuse (33) zwei koaxial ineinander und einen gegenseitigen radialen Abstand zueinander aufweisende Wärmetauscherschlangen (11,12) angeordnet sind, wobei in die innere Wärmetauscherschlange (11) eine nach unten gerichtete Heizflamme (7) hineinreicht, welche eine Strömungsumlenkung an einem unteren Pralltop (8) erfährt, und wobei das Heißgas zunächst an dem inneren Wärmetauscher (11) entlangströmt und mittels Strömungsumlenkungsmitteln dann den äußeren Wärmetauscher (12) durchströmt, wonach es dann durch einen Kamin (25) entweicht, wobei im Zwischenraum zwischen der inneren Wärmetauscherschlange (11) und der äußeren Wärmetauscherschlange (12) eine weitere spiralförmige Schrägwicklung (31) aufgewickelt ist, welche den Zwischenraum (15) zwischen dem inneren und dem äußeren Wärmetauscher ausfüllt und wobei im Außenbereich (16) auf den äußeren Wärmetauscher (12) eine Schrägwicklung (30) aufgewickelt ist, welche den Zwischenraum (16) zwischen dem äußeren Wärmetauscher (12) und der Gehäusewand ausfüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 7/02; F24H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812232 U1 19990909; DK 0971194 T3 20030414; EP 0971194 A2 20000112; EP 0971194 A3 20001011; EP 0971194 B1 20030115

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160708

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-06-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-04-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904020 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK IT

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK IT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI