Global patent index - EP 0971197 A2

EP 0971197 A2 2000-01-12 - Method for applying an armoured layer to the body of a passenger car

Title (en)

Method for applying an armoured layer to the body of a passenger car

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Panzerung an der Karosserie eines Fahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Méthode pour monter une couche blindée dans la carrosserie d'une voiture

Publication

EP 0971197 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890212 A

Priority

AT 117298 A

Abstract (en)

Inside of the body cell framework, impact-resistant armor panels are fastened. They are profiled to fit allocated regions (21-31) of the bodywork (10). Preferred features: Panels are adhered inside the bodywork and as appropriate, to each other. They overlap. Inside the bodywork a parting agent is applied, e.g. a separation sheet. This includes regions (31-41) defined by lines of separation and comprises polyester material, preferably fiber-reinforced. It is used to make moldings and from these, press tools to make the internal cladding panels. Plastically-deformable material is applied to individual regions (31-42) inside the bodywork (10) surrounded along the edges by templets to make moldings, used in turn to make pressing dies for the panels. Moldings are edge-reinforced, to accommodate inward productions of bodywork. Profiling and bodywork-surrounding shapes are converted into electronic data, to make the press tools. Internal regions of mutual closure are given matching profiles. The electronic data is used to make press tools by milling from hard plastic. Panels include cable channels and holes. They comprise high molecular weight polyethylene and/or aramid. They are plastic sheets and/or mats laminated and shaped under heat and pressure. Reinforcements comprise e.g. steel, ceramic, glass, carbon or slag, in fiber or mat form. Panels comprise polyethylene with at least one layer of aramid bonded to them, e.g. using tufted strips of polyethylene. The layer of aramid is sewn to polyethylene sheets using aramid fiber. Inside the bodywork, nuts or bolts are welded, and used to fasten the panels, through holes provided.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Panzerung an der Karosserie eines Fahrzeuges, insbesondere eines Personenkraftfahrzeuges, wobei an der Innenseite der Karosserie [1] einzelne aneinander schließende Panzerplatten befestigt werden. Dabei werden an der Innenseite der die Fahrzeugzelle (10) umgebenden Karosserie (1) aus beschußfestem Kunststoffmaterial hergestellte Panzerplatten, welche den zugeordneten Bereichen (21 bis 31) der Karosserie (10) gegengleich profiliert sind, befestigt (Fig.1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/044 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971197 A2 20000112; EP 0971197 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010915

2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI