Global Patent Index - EP 0971198 A4

EP 0971198 A4 2001-01-24 - ROBOT FOR EXPLODING LAND MINES

Title (en)

ROBOT FOR EXPLODING LAND MINES

Title (de)

ROBOT ZUR DETONATION VON LANDMINEN

Title (fr)

ROBOT SERVANT A FAIRE EXPLOSER DES MINES TERRESTRES

Publication

EP 0971198 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98961407 A

Priority

  • JP 9805733 W
  • JP 3665798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971198A1] A robot for exploding land mines buried under the ground in an unmanned manner. The robot works to safely and reliably explode the land mines independently of the laid form of a mine field. Two frames (11, 11) of a cylindrical shape are rotatably and coaxially coupled together to constitute an outer frame (10). Inside the outer frame (10) is provided a main body (20) for running the outer frame (10) by rotating the frames (11, 11) independently of each other. Guide bars (40) extending back and forth in the direction in which the outer frame (10) runs are attached to the side surfaces of the main body (20). On the outer peripheral surfaces of the frames (11, 11) are mounted a plurality of contacts (30, 30), made of a flexible material and radially extending from a plurality of places on the outer peripheral surface. At the time of climbing a hill, the rear ends of the guide bars (40) come in contact with the surface of the ground, and the hill-climbing ability increases. When passing over dents, the contacts (30, 30) come in contact with the surface of the ground, and no land mine remains untouched. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 11/16

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/28 (2013.01); F41H 11/18 (2013.01); F41H 11/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] DE 2622162 A1 19771201 - MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 331 (M - 1626) 23 June 1994 (1994-06-23)
  • See also references of WO 9939155A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971198 A1 20000112; EP 0971198 A4 20010124; CA 2284827 A1 19990805; CN 1251649 A 20000426; JP 2862861 B1 19990303; JP H11218400 A 19990810; KR 20000076240 A 20001226; TW 368598 B 19990901; WO 9939155 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-01-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991001

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT