Global Patent Index - EP 0971200 B1

EP 0971200 B1 2002-11-13 - Acoustic ammunition

Title (en)

Acoustic ammunition

Title (de)

Akustische Munition

Title (fr)

Munition acoustique

Publication

EP 0971200 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401658 A

Priority

FR 9808685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971200A1] The acoustic munition has an energy source which feeds fuel and oxidizer to nozzles when a cover (4) is ejected on ground impact to produce noise of the munition casing tube resonance frequency. The acoustic munition comprises: (a) a closed metal tube (1) with a removable cover (4) at one end; (b) internal heating nozzles (9) fixed on the tube base (2); (c) a honeycomb insert (8) above the nozzles; (d) an energy source for feeding fuel and oxidizer to the nozzles and enclosed within an external aerodynamic nose (3) fixed onto the base (2); (e) a deployable fin tail (5) and a propellant charge, both fixed externally on the removable cover (4); (f) a pyrotechnic charge (6) for ejecting the cover when the fired munition hits the ground; and (g) a piezoelectric sensor (7) coupled to a nozzle igniter, to the energy source and to the cutting charge for controlling cover ejection and supply of fuel and oxidizer to the nozzles and for triggering production of noise of the resonance frequency of the tube by energy exchange between the tube base (2) and its end (1b) in contact with ambient air when the cover is ejected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971200 A1 20000112; EP 0971200 B1 20021113; DE 69903885 D1 20021219; DE 69903885 T2 20030911; FR 2781044 A1 20000114; FR 2781044 B1 20001006

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903885

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69903885

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903885

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903885 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI