Global patent index - EP 0971211 A2

EP 0971211 A2 2000-01-12 - Exhaust gas sampling method using a flow rate detector with variable Venturi

Title (en)

Exhaust gas sampling method using a flow rate detector with variable Venturi

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Entnahme einer Abgasprobe unter Verwendung eines Durchflussmengenmessers mit veränderbarem Venturiabschnitt

Title (fr)

Méthode d'échantillonnage de gaz d'échappement utilisant un débitmètre à Venturi variable

Publication

EP 0971211 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305474 A

Priority

  • JP 19414998 A
  • JP 2342299 A

Abstract (en)

A flow rate detector mechanism using variable Venturi therein, comprising: a variable flow rate , generator, comprising: a core 11; and a variable Venturi 12; wherein a throat (flow passage) cross-sectional area defined between the core and the venturi is able to be changed by shifting relative positions of the core and the venturi in a direction of axes thereof, and further comprising a flow rate calculation processing portion 30 for calculating a flow rate based on the relative positions in the direction of the axes thereof and for outputting the calculated flow rate, thereby continuously changing the constant flow rate, without occurrence of any disturbance therein. Further, with an exhaust gas sampling method applying the flow rate detector mechanism using variable Venturi, CVS flow rate is changed within the range of the phases of measure modes, so as to make small the difference between the peak dew point in the bag and the final dew point in the bag, as well as to causethe final dew point to approach the temperature at which the bag is kept. Therefore, the dilution ratio of the final dew point is decreased, so as to improve the accuracy in analysis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01F 1/44; G01N 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 1/44 (2006.01); G01F 7/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/0016 (2013.01); G01F 1/44 (2013.01); G01F 7/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971211 A2 20000112; EP 0971211 A3 20000412; EP 0971211 B1 20071128; CA 2277395 A1 20000109; CA 2277395 C 20081014; DE 69937620 D1 20080110; DE 69937620 T2 20081023; US 2001013245 A1 20010816; US 6405577 B2 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100709

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69937620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100709

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090702

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090708

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071128

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071128

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071128

2008-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69937620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20080110

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2007-11-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-06-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: EXHAUST GAS SAMPLING METHOD USING A FLOW RATE DETECTOR WITH VARIABLE VENTURI

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040511

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: EXHAUST GAS SAMPLING METHOD USING A FLOW RATE DETECTOR WITH VARIABLE VENTURI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI