Global patent index - EP 0971279 A1

EP 0971279 A1 2000-01-12 - Calibrating method of a resistor in an integrated circuit and apparatus for executing this method

Title (en)

Calibrating method of a resistor in an integrated circuit and apparatus for executing this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abgleichen eines Widerstandes in einer integrierten Schaltung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de calibrage d'une résistance dans un circuit intégré et dispositif pour la réalisation dudit procédé

Publication

EP 0971279 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113054 A

Priority

DE 19830356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830356C1] The circuit incorporates a variable resistor (M1) which consists of a FET. This forms part of a resistor (RM) to be balanced. A generator (IREF) produces a constant current (IM) which is to be fed to a switch (S3). The voltage (VRM) across the whole resistor may be measured. The drain-source path in the FET acts as the variable resistor. The source is connected to earth (GND) and the drain is connected to the other resistor (R1). The gate (G) of the transistor is connected via a switch (S2) to a further switch (S1) connected to resistors (R2,R1) and a voltage source (V1).

Abstract (de)

Dem einen steuerbaren Widerstand M1 (FET )enthaltenden abzugleichenden Widerstand RM wird ein Konstantstrom IM eingeprägt, dann der Istwert der durch den Konstantstrom IM am abzugleichenden Widerstand RM verursachten Spannung VRM mit einer als Sollwert vorgegebenen Referenzspannung Vref verglichen und der steuerbare Widerstand M1 solange verändert, bis der Istwert der am Widerstand RM abfallenden Spannung VRM mit dem Sollwert der Referenzspannung Vref übereinstimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/575 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/575 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830356 C1 19991111; EP 0971279 A1 20000112; EP 0971279 B1 20030924

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI