Global patent index - EP 0971316 A3

EP 0971316 A3 2000-01-19 - Spatially-selective edge enhancement for discrete pixel images

Title (en)

Spatially-selective edge enhancement for discrete pixel images

Title (de)

Räumlich selektive Randverbesserung für Bilder mit diskreten Bildelementen

Title (fr)

Amélioration des bords spatialement sélectif pour des images à pixels discrets

Publication

EP 0971316 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305432 A

Priority

US 11365398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971316A2] A discrete pixel image (106) is enhanced to bring out particular features of interest such as edges. The enhancement includes decomposition of the original processed image data, enhancement by application of gain images to the decomposed images, and reconstruction of the enhanced image. The decomposition proceeds through a series of low-pass filters (110,112) to arrive at decomposed images of progressively lower spatial frequencies. These decomposed images are then multiplied by gain images during the enhancement phase. Gain images for at least the higher spatial frequency level images are derived (116) from lower spatial frequency level images. These spatial frequency-based gain images may be based upon operator inputs, including a spatial sensitivity, fimction and an edge enhancement value. Lower spatial frequency level images may be processed by application (118) of predetermined gain values. The reconstruction sequence recombines the decomposed images (120) after application of the gains to arrive at an enhanced image of the same dimensions as the original image. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/409 (2006.01); A61B 6/00 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 5/00 (2006.01); G06T 5/20 (2006.01); G06T 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 5/003 (2013.01); G06T 5/50 (2013.01); G06T 2207/10116 (2013.01); G06T 2207/20016 (2013.01); G06T 2207/20192 (2013.01); G06T 2207/30004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971316 A2 20000112; EP 0971316 A3 20000119; CA 2276634 A1 20000110; JP 2000059631 A 20000225; US 6175658 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status

2009-07-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090203

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050121

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI