Global Patent Index - EP 0971323 A1

EP 0971323 A1 2000-01-12 - Coin entry module

Title (en)

Coin entry module

Title (de)

Münzeingabemodul

Title (fr)

Module pour l'introduction de pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0971323 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202240 A

Priority

  • EP 99202240 A
  • EP 98305499 A

Abstract (en)

A coin entry module has a plurality of chambers (13, 25) through which a coin must pass before reaching a coin exit (15) leading to a coin chute. Inserted coins change their angular direction at least once in passing from a coin entry slot to the second chamber. Any coin inserted must also change its angular direction prior to leaving the second chamber. Any object inserted in an attempt to block the passage of coins will be trapped by the first or second chamber thus minimising potential lost coinage by bona-fide customers and minimising or preventing coin recovery by thieves. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971323 A1 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20091008

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060731

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI