Global patent index - EP 0971326 A2

EP 0971326 A2 2000-01-12 - Entertainment machines

Title (en)

Entertainment machines

Title (de)

Unterhaltungsgeräte

Title (fr)

Machines d'amusement

Publication

EP 0971326 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305486 A

Priority

GB 9814794 A

Abstract (en)

An entertainment machine which has a supplementary game playing display region 15 with a trail 17 and a number of award zones 22-26 associated with the trail. Play is transferred from the trail to the award zones 22-26 by a zone selector which may be a player operable push-button 27 or alternatively there may be automatic zone selection. Alternatively the prize zones may be player operable by a plurality of push buttons, which may or may not be linked to individually selectable prize zones. The player can operate the button 27 to obtain awards from the zones, or continue to play by transferring from zone to zone to try to obtain greater awards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3267 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2333880 A 19990804; GB 2333880 B 20010314; GB 9814794 D0 19980909; DE 69906632 D1 20030515; DE 69906632 T2 20040325; DE 971326 T1 20010906; EP 0971326 A2 20000112; EP 0971326 A3 20001004; EP 0971326 B1 20030409; ES 2196725 T3 20031216

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070710

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070710

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080201

2006-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2196725

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES NL

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IGT-UK LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-06 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES NL

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI