Global patent index - EP 0971330 A1

EP 0971330 A1 2000-01-12 - Verbal remote control device

Title (en)

Verbal remote control device

Title (de)

Verbale Fernsteuerungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande à distance verbal

Publication

EP 0971330 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99111901 A

Priority

US 11135598 A

Abstract (en)

A verbal remote control device receives requests, such as for elevator service, unlocking vehicles, controlling alarms, by using voice recognition to decode spoken requests of the user, the device using speech synthesis to respond to the user with information, or to request information from the user. The device may be one that normally has a low power consumption dormant mode and is awakened in the proximity of apparatus to be controlled thereby either by beacons or by a user activated switch. In an elevator system, the device is used to enter, cancel and change destination-type requests for elevator service. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/06 (2006.01); B66B 1/14 (2006.01); G08C 17/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/00 (2006.01); H04Q 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/00 (2013.01); G08C 2201/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971330 A1 20000112; BR 9902470 A 20000314; CN 1244693 A 20000216; JP 2000106697 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021108

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI