Global Patent Index - EP 0971336 A3

EP 0971336 A3 2000-04-05 - Apparatus and methods for selective imaging in nonemissive display systems

Title (en)

Apparatus and methods for selective imaging in nonemissive display systems

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur selektiven Bilderzeugung in einem nicht-emitierenden Anzeigesystem

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour la formation sélective d'images dans un dispositif d'affichage non émissif

Publication

EP 0971336 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305485 A

Priority

US 11368198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971336A2] A writing head (100) capable of rapidly and efficiently generating high field gradients while remaining amenable to low-voltage control utilises a piezoelectric (110) or Rosen transformer. A one- or two- dimensional array of such writing heads may be used to address a substrate (127) bearing an arrangement of electrically responsive, nonemissive display elements (125), applying an image pattern thereto. Similarly, the array of writing heads can be used to remove an image, returning the substrate (127) to its original unimaged state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/37 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/344 (2013.01); G09F 9/372 (2013.01); G09G 2380/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971336 A2 20000112; EP 0971336 A3 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR SELECTIVE IMAGING IN NONEMISSIVE DISPLAY SYSTEMS

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI