Global Patent Index - EP 0971344 B9

EP 0971344 B9 2009-02-18 - Optical recording medium

Title (en)

Optical recording medium

Title (de)

Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium

Title (fr)

Médium d' enregistrement optique

Publication

EP 0971344 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 99113267 A

Priority

  • JP 19453798 A
  • JP 31147398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971344A1] An optical recording medium incorporating a supporting body; a recording portion which is formed on either main surface of the supporting body and on which a signal is recorded; and a light permeable layer formed on the recording portion, wherein light is applied from a position adjacent to the light permeable layer to record/reproduce a signal, and carboxylic acid amine salt expressed by general formula (1) and/or general formula (2) is held on the surface which is irradiated with light <CHEM> where n is an integer from 1 to 3, each of R1 and R2 is hydrogen or a hydrocarbon group, R3 is a hydrocarbon group and Rf is a perfluoroalkyl group having three or more carbon atoms, <CHEM> where at least either of R1 and R2 is perfluoroalkyl group having three or more carbon atoms, at least any one of R1, R2, R3, R4 and R5 is hydrocarbon group having 12 or more carbon atoms and the rest of them are hydrogen or hydrocarbon group. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24 (2006.01); C09K 3/16 (2006.01); G11B 7/254 (2006.01); G11B 7/257 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/252 (2013.01); G11B 7/2542 (2013.01); G11B 7/2534 (2013.01); G11B 7/2545 (2013.01); G11B 7/2548 (2013.01); G11B 7/2585 (2013.01); G11B 2007/24306 (2013.01); G11B 2007/25417 (2013.01); G11B 2007/2571 (2013.01); G11B 2007/25713 (2013.01); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01); Y10S 430/146 (2013.01); Y10T 428/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971344 A1 20000112; EP 0971344 B1 20080514; EP 0971344 B9 20090218; DE 69938695 D1 20080626; JP 2000082236 A 20000321; US 6309726 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69938695

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090702

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090705

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090217

2008-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938695 P 20080626

2008-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE NL

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI