Global patent index - EP 0971365 A1

EP 0971365 A1 2000-01-12 - Heating-extruding and solidifying apparatus of combustible low-level radioactive wastes

Title (en)

Heating-extruding and solidifying apparatus of combustible low-level radioactive wastes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Extrudieren, Erhitzen und Verfestigen von brennbaren, schwach radioaktiven Abfallstoffen

Title (fr)

Appareil d'extrusion, chauffage et solidification de déchets combustibles de faible niveau de radioactivité

Publication

EP 0971365 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98112545 A

Priority

EP 98112545 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for heating-extruding and solidifying combustible low-level radioactive wastes comprises a hopper 2 for temporarily storing combustible radioactive wastes and a heating-extruding axis 3 having an extruding screw, said heating-extruding axis being provided with a heating element at its cylinder. A rotary press 4 is located at the outlet of said heating-extruding axis 3 for heating and pressing heated and extruded wastes. Systems 15 and 19 are located around said rotary press 4 for performing simultaneous heating and cooling operation. Said rotary press 4 is provided with a lift type rotary pusher 5 for demolding pressed and solidified wastes. Accumulator 7 is disposed at the wastes carrying-out side of said rotary press 4. A forward and backward remover is disposed at the front of said accumulator 7 for pulling said molded wastes 8 on the lift pusher 5 and carrying said molded wastes 8 toward accumulator 7. An inhalation duct 10 is disposed at a location where gas generated from the outlet of said heating-extruding axis 3 and the inlet of said rotary press 4 is inhaled, i.e., at the top of said rotary press, said inhalation duct 10 being connected to a HEPA filter 11 through a duct. The outlet of said filter is connected to an inhalation fan 12, the outlet of said inhalation fan 12 being connected to a scrubber 13. Said scrubber 13 having a circulation water tank 14. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/00 (2006.01); G21F 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/008 (2013.01); G21F 9/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971365 A1 20000112; EP 0971365 B1 20040204; DE 69821471 D1 20040311; DE 69821471 T2 20041125

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150707

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150707

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69821471

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2004-05-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040515

2004-05-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69821471

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040311

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB LI NL SE

2004-02-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020423

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000513

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FI FR GB LI NL SE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB LI NL SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI