Global Patent Index - EP 0971383 A3

EP 0971383 A3 2000-11-15 - Contact arrangement of a current switch

Title (en)

Contact arrangement of a current switch

Title (de)

Stromkontaktanordnungen eines Stromschalters

Title (fr)

Agencement de contact d'un commutateur de courant

Publication

EP 0971383 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810569 A

Priority

DE 19830231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971383A2] The current contact device has a movable current contact (K1) which in the closed switch position cooperates with a second current contact (K2). This is done via a movable contact bridge (3) acted on by a bias spring (4), which is spaced from both current contacts in the open position of the switch. The movement of the contact bridge is effected via a bridge guide (A), mechanically coupled to one of the current contacts

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/38; H01H 33/14; H01H 33/98

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/38 (2006.01); H01H 33/14 (2006.01); H01H 33/98 (2006.01); H01H 33/985 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/14 (2013.01); H01H 1/385 (2013.01); H01H 33/98 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971383 A2 20000112; EP 0971383 A3 20001115; DE 19830231 A1 20000113; DE 19830231 B4 20081023

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070626

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051024

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI