Global Patent Index - EP 0971386 A2

EP 0971386 A2 2000-01-12 - Triode structure flat panel display employing flat field emission cathodes

Title (en)

Triode structure flat panel display employing flat field emission cathodes

Title (de)

Flache Feldemissionskathode anwendende flache Anzeigevorrichtung mit Triodenstruktur

Title (fr)

Affichage à écran plat à structure triode utilisant des cathodes plates à émission de champ

Publication

EP 0971386 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202988 A

Priority

  • EP 94905334 A
  • US 99386392 A

Abstract (en)

A flat panel display of a field emission type having a triode (three terminal) structure and useful as a device for displaying visual information is disclosed. The display comprises a plurality of corresponding light-emitting anodes and field-emission cathodes, each of the anodes emitting light in response to emission from each of the corresponding cathodes, each of the cathodes including a layer of low work function material having a relatively flat emission surface comprising a plurality of distributed localized electron emission sites and a grid assembly interspersed between the corresponding anodes and cathodes to thereby control emission levels to the anodes from the corresponding cathodes. In the preferred embodiment of the invention, the layer of low work function material is amorphic diamond film. The grid assembly comprises a conductive layer deposited between the plurality of anodes and cathodes and over interstices between the cathodes, the conductive layer having apertures therein, the cathodes aligned with, and of the same size as, the apertures. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 9/02 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01); H01J 63/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 63/06 (2013.01); H01J 1/304 (2013.01); H01J 1/3042 (2013.01); H01J 9/027 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01); H01J 2201/30457 (2013.01); H01J 2201/319 (2013.01); H01J 2329/8625 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9415352 A1 19940707; AU 5897494 A 19940719; CA 2152472 A1 19940707; DE 69328977 D1 20000810; DE 69328977 T2 20001228; DE 69333555 D1 20040722; DE 69333555 T2 20050818; EP 0676084 A1 19951011; EP 0676084 A4 19970219; EP 0676084 B1 20000705; EP 0971386 A2 20000112; EP 0971386 A3 20000517; EP 0971386 B1 20040616; JP H08505259 A 19960604

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131207

2013-12-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69333555

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., KR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69333555

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-12-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69333555

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111206

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111206

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69333555

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0676084

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NANO-PROPRIETARY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KUMAR, NALIN

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: XIE, CHENGGANG

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KUMAR, NALIN

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: XIE, CHENGGANG

2000-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SI DIAMOND TECHNOLOGY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-01-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 676084

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL