Global Patent Index - EP 0971434 A1

EP 0971434 A1 2000-01-12 - Composite switch circuit and composite switch device

Title (en)

Composite switch circuit and composite switch device

Title (de)

Zusammengesetzter Schaltkreis und Schaltgerät dazu

Title (fr)

Circuit de commutation composé et dispositif de commutation composé

Publication

EP 0971434 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98112502 A

Priority

EP 98112502 A

Abstract (en)

A composite switch circuit (30) for alternately and electrically connecting a first circuit (Tx) to a third circuit (ANT) or a second circuit (Rx) to said third circuit (ANT). The composite switch circuit (30) is incorporated with a low pass filter circuit (LPF) in the switch circuit portion of the composite switch circuit (30) so as to create a highly symmetrical circuit configuration. The composite switch circuit (30) is disposed on a plurality of dielectric substrates (22-28) of a integral multi-layer body (2) to provide a miniaturised composite switch device. Since the composite switch device including the composite switch circuit (30) with a symmetrical circuit configuration shows a low insertion loss and a high performance in a broad frequency range, the composite switch device is advantageously used to form a portion of a radio transceiver such as a cellular radiotelephone. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0784384 A1 19970716 - TDK CORP [JP]
  • [DA] EP 0785590 A1 19970723 - MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]
  • [A] MANDAI H ET AL: "ADVANCED MULTI-LAYER CERAMIC SURFACE-MOUNT FUNCTIONAL COMPONENTS FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS EQUIPMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, LAS VEGAS, MAY 21 - 24, 1995, no. CONF. 45, 21 May 1995 (1995-05-21), INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, pages 247 - 250, XP002029547

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971434 A1 20000112; EP 0971434 B1 20070530; CN 1545215 A 20041110; CN 1545215 B 20100811; DE 69837841 D1 20070712; DE 69837841 T2 20080124; ES 2287964 T3 20071216

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180705

2018-07-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69837841

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170705

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120707

2013-10-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131022

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2287964 T3

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837841 P 20070712

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB NL SE

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FI FR GB NL SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB NL SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI