Global Patent Index - EP 0971450 A1

EP 0971450 A1 2000-01-12 - Secondary locked electrical connector

Title (en)

Secondary locked electrical connector

Title (de)

Elekktrischer Verbinder mit Sekundärverriegelung

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique à verrouillage secondaire

Publication

EP 0971450 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99201904 A

Priority

DE 19830799 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector (10) comprising a connector housing (12) including a main body (11) and an insert (15), the main body having a front face (16), a rear face (18), and a plurality of terminal receiving cavities (14) extending in a longitudinal direction (A) between the front and rear faces, each terminal receiving cavity being defined in part by opposed side walls (26,28), and a flexible beam (34) which is attached at a first end (36) to the front face and at a second end (38) to the rear face and which has a rigid locking tab (42) extending into the terminal receiving cavity, the insert having a planar front portion (19) positioned adjacent the front face and an arm portion (21) which makes a sliding fit in a direction substantially perpendicular to the longitudinal direction in a slot (17) in the main body, the slot opening through the front face and into each terminal receiving cavity on a side opposite to the flexible beam, the arm portion defining a rigid side (24) of each terminal receiving cavity and having a rigid locking tab (30) extending into each terminal receiving cavity; and a female electrical terminal (22) positioned in one of the terminal receiving cavities and having a recess (27) for receiving the locking tab on the flexible beam in a snap fit, a recess (58) for receiving the locking tab on the arm portion in a sliding fit, and a first end (46) for receiving a male terminal inserted through an opening (64) in the front portion of the insert. The connector is simple in design, easy to manufacture, and provides a rigid to rigid locking feature. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 13/424

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/424 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/424 (2013.01); H01R 13/4362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971450 A1 20000112; EP 0971450 B1 20021023; DE 19830799 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-02-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030615

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-07-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030615

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903598 20021128

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SECONDARY LOCKED ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI