Global Patent Index - EP 0971457 A1

EP 0971457 A1 2000-01-12 - Set of connections by insertion

Title (en)

Set of connections by insertion

Title (de)

Eindrücksteckverbinder

Title (fr)

Ensemble de connexion à insertion

Publication

EP 0971457 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401363 A

Priority

FR 9808831 A

Abstract (en)

The insertable connection construction has a cavity (5) with an upper wall (43) having metallized strip sets (7). A socket (10) has a contact face (19) with metal contacts (17,18). The side wall (41) and contact face (43) are elasticated, and an inset holds the socket in place.

Abstract (fr)

Dans un ensemble de connexion à insertion, on prévoit de munir d'une languette une paroi d'une cavité d'un socle qui accueille une fiche à insérer. Cette languette est destinée à se bloquer élastiquement dans une encoche plane de la fiche. Ce faisant, on laisse disponible des extrémités latérales du connecteur pour former des guides d'insertion de la fiche. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/639

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/26 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/738 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/26 (2013.01); H01R 13/627 (2013.01); H01R 2201/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971457 A1 20000112; EP 0971457 B1 20080528; AU 3911799 A 20000203; AU 738859 B2 20010927; CA 2274624 A1 20000109; DE 69938807 D1 20080710; ES 2308831 T3 20081201; FR 2781091 A1 20000114; FR 2781091 B1 20000811; JP 2000082545 A 20000321; US 6210201 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170607

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170607

2018-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170608

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: Z124, GB

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-04-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: Z124, GB

- Effective date: 20130328

2012-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120927 AND 20121003

2012-10-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120920 AND 20120926

2012-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2012-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: T&A MOBILE PHONES LIMITED

- Free text: TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED#ROOM 1502, 15/F.,TOWER 6#CHINA HONG KONG CITY, 33 CANTON ROAD, TSIM SHA TSUI,KOWLOON, HONG KONG (CN) -TRANSFER TO- T&A MOBILE PHONES LIMITED#ROOM 1502, 15F, TOWER 6 CHINA HONG KONG CITY 33 CANTON ROAD TSIM SHA TSUI KOWLOON#HONG KONG (CN)

2012-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: Z124

- Free text: IMERJ, LIMITED#P.O. BOX 309 UGLAND HOUSE#GRAND CAYMAN (KY) -TRANSFER TO- Z124#P.O. BOX 309 UGLAND HOUSE#GRAND CAYMAN (KY)

2012-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: IMERJ, LIMITED

- Free text: FLEXTRONICS INNOVATIVE DEVELOPMENT, LTD.#P.O. BOX 309 UGLAND HOUSE#GRAND CAYMAN (KY) -TRANSFER TO- IMERJ, LIMITED#P.O. BOX 309 UGLAND HOUSE#GRAND CAYMAN (KY)

2012-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TCT MOBILE LIMITED

- Free text: T&A MOBILE PHONES LIMITED#ROOM 1502, 15F, TOWER 6 CHINA HONG KONG CITY 33 CANTON ROAD TSIM SHA TSUI KOWLOON#HONG KONG (CN) -TRANSFER TO- TCT MOBILE LIMITED#ROOM 1502, 15/F.,TOWER 6#CHINA HONG KONG CITY, 33 CANTON ROAD, TSIM SHA TSUI,KOWLOON, HONG KONG (CN)

2012-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: IPG ELECTRONICS 504 LIMITED

- Free text: TCT MOBILE LIMITED#ROOM 1502, 15/F.,TOWER 6#CHINA HONG KONG CITY, 33 CANTON ROAD, TSIM SHA TSUI,KOWLOON, HONG KONG (CN) -TRANSFER TO- IPG ELECTRONICS 504 LIMITED#TRAFALGAR COURT BOX 255 LES BANQUES#ST PETER PORT, GUERNSEY GY1 3QL (GB)

2012-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FLEXTRONICS INNOVATIVE DEVELOPMENT, LTD.

- Free text: IPG ELECTRONICS 504 LIMITED#TRAFALGAR COURT BOX 255 LES BANQUES#ST PETER PORT, GUERNSEY GY1 3QL (GB) -TRANSFER TO- FLEXTRONICS INNOVATIVE DEVELOPMENT, LTD.#P.O. BOX 309 UGLAND HOUSE#GRAND CAYMAN (KY)

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2308831 T3

2008-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938807 P 20080710

2008-06-25 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2008-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED

2005-08-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAM HOLDINGS LIMITED

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI