Global Patent Index - EP 0971458 A2

EP 0971458 A2 2000-01-12 - Holder and restraining device for a socket of a plug system in communications and data networks

Title (en)

Holder and restraining device for a socket of a plug system in communications and data networks

Title (de)

Halterung und Abfangvorrichtung für eine Steckerbuchse eines Steckersystems in Kommunikations- und Datennetzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation et support pour une partie femelle d'un système de connection pour communications et réseau de données

Publication

EP 0971458 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112569 A

Priority

DE 19829486 A

Abstract (en)

The holder includes a bending mould unit (BT) which has a recess (AN) adjusted to the outer form of the female connector (SB). The recess has snap-in elements which can be engaged in corresponding recesses (RA) of the female connector. A support unit (AV) is provided at the bending mould unit on the cable supply side of the female connector. The support unit has a clamping slot (KSL) in which the cable sheath is fixed and the cable screen is electrically contacted. The bending mould unit has snap-on elements (RSG) for fixing in a screen housing (SG). The entire arrangement is clamped on a mounting plate using snap-on elements (RL,RMP).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Halterung und Abfangvorrichtung für eine Steckerbuchse (SB) eines Steckersystems in Kommunikations- und Datennetzen. Es wird ein Biegeformteil (BT) zur Aufnahme einer an sich bekannten Steckerbuchse (SB) verwendet, das mit Rastelementen (RSG) in einem Schirmgehäuse (SG) eingesetzt ist. Die gesamte Anordnung wird auf einer Montageplatte (MP) in einer handelsüblichen Unterputzdose eingerastet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/658; H01R 12/18; H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2013.01); H01R 23/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829486 C1 19991118; DE 59913904 D1 20061123; EP 0971458 A2 20000112; EP 0971458 A3 20021218; EP 0971458 B1 20061011

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913904 P 20061123

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HOLDER AND RESTRAINING DEVICE FOR A SOCKET OF A PLUG SYSTEM IN COMMUNICATIONS AND DATA NETWORKS

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCS TECHNOLOGY, INC.

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI