Global Patent Index - EP 0971511 A2

EP 0971511 A2 2000-01-12 - Traffic shaper

Title (en)

Traffic shaper

Title (de)

Verkehrsformer

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise en forme de trafic

Publication

EP 0971511 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113167 A

Priority

JP 19396098 A

Abstract (en)

A traffic shaper comprises a cell buffer for temporarily storing an ATM cell arrived thereat, a first calculator for calculating an estimated cell sending time according to a VC contracted bandwidth, a second calculator for calculating an estimated cell sending time according to a VP contracted bandwidth, a binary tree VP sorting circuit for determining VP to be sent in top priority, a binary tree VC sorting circuit for determining VC to be sent in top priority, and a sending circuit for sending a cell in which the determined VP and VC are both brought to a transmittable state. The VP estimated sending time is revised according to the VC estimated sending time. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/56; H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/801 (2013.01); H04L 12/815 (2013.01); H04L 12/851 (2013.01); H04L 12/863 (2013.01); H04L 12/911 (2013.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/5601 (2013.01); H04L 12/5602 (2013.01); H04L 47/22 (2013.01); H04L 47/2433 (2013.01); H04L 47/2441 (2013.01); H04L 47/50 (2013.01); H04L 47/522 (2013.01); H04L 47/627 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0478 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5651 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5652 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5679 (2013.01); H04L 2012/568 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971511 A2 20000112; EP 0971511 A3 20050921; EP 0971511 B1 20070829; DE 69936958 D1 20071011; DE 69936958 T2 20080410; DE 69942552 D1 20100812; EP 1816808 A1 20070808; EP 1816808 B1 20100630; EP 2214354 A1 20100804; EP 2230804 A1 20100922; EP 2230804 B1 20141119; JP 2000031974 A 20000128; JP 3711752 B2 20051102; US 2003007455 A1 20030109; US 2008117817 A1 20080522; US 6512741 B1 20030128; US 7324521 B2 20080129; US 8630175 B2 20140114

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-09-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20180809 AND 20180815

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-08-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALAXALA NETWORKS CORP., KAWASAKI-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI, LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69936958

2018-08-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69936958

- Representative's name: STREHL SCHUEBEL-HOPF & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAE, DE

2018-06-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170705

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080530

2008-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69936958 P 20071011

2007-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-08-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-09-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 A

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI