Global patent index - EP 0971592 A1

EP 0971592 A1 2000-01-19 - SYNERGETIC FUNGICIDE COMPOSITION

Title (en)

SYNERGETIC FUNGICIDE COMPOSITION

Title (de)

SYNERGISTISCHE FUNGIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION FONGICIDE SYNERGIQUE

Publication

EP 0971592 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98917280 A

Priority

  • FR 9800654 W
  • FR 9704369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2761577A1] Disclosed is a synergetic fungicide composition comprising propamocarbe and a derivative of phosphorous acid. The invention further proposes a process for the preventive or curative combat of phytopathogenic mushrooms which employs this composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 57/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 57/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 57/12 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 57/12 + A01N 47/12
  2. A01N 57/12 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844801A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2761577 A1 19981009; FR 2761577 B1 19990514; AU 7053798 A 19981030; BR 9815465 A 20010731; CA 2285649 A1 19981015; CA 2285649 C 20090630; CO 5040023 A1 20010529; EP 0971592 A1 20000119; HR P980178 A2 19990228; IL 132157 D0 20010319; US 6358938 B1 20020319; WO 9844801 A1 19981015; ZA 9802863 B 19981008

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE S.A.

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991001

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE