Global patent index - EP 0971596 A1

EP 0971596 A1 2000-01-19 - WHIPPED TOPPING

Title (en)

WHIPPED TOPPING

Title (de)

AUFGESCHÄUMTE TOPPINGZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

GARNITURE DE CREME FOUETTEE

Publication

EP 0971596 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902637 A

Priority

  • US 9801025 W
  • US 78735997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9831236A1] Whipped food products having enhanced temperature stability and good organoleptic properties are described. The whipped food products, which can be maintained at room temperature, freezer or refrigerator temperature for an extended period of time, are prepared by blending a temperature stabilizing effective amount of non-tropical lauric oil with the other ingredients of the whipped product. The non-tropical lauric oil contains at least about 30 % lauric acid in its triglycerie molecule.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23C 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23D 7/00 (2006.01); A23L 1/00 (2006.01); A23L 1/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23D 7/003 (2013.01); A23L 9/22 (2016.08); A23L 9/24 (2016.08); A23P 30/40 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9831236 A1 19980723; AU 5924598 A 19980807; BR 9806982 A 20000314; CA 2278191 A1 19980723; EP 0971596 A1 20000119; EP 0971596 A4 20000705

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021104

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOLORIO, HECTOR, A.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: O'MAHONY, JOHN, S.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AURAND, TOM, J.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990820

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE