Global Patent Index - EP 0971605 A1

EP 0971605 A1 2000-01-19 - SHOE, ESPECIALLY SPORTS OR DANCING SHOE

Title (en)

SHOE, ESPECIALLY SPORTS OR DANCING SHOE

Title (de)

SCHUH, INSBESONDERE SPORT- ODER TANZSCHUH

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE, NOTAMMENT CHAUSSURE DE SPORT OU DE DANSE

Publication

EP 0971605 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906213 A

Priority

  • DE 29801638 U
  • EP 9900621 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6233846B1] The shoe has a sole which has a ball section and a heel, the heel having an open middle section under the heel of the foot which is bridged by a bridging element. The bridging element is rigid. The open middle section of the heel can reach as far as the front edge of the heel so that this is U- or C-shaped. The edge section of the bridging element can overlap with the inner edge of the heel. The ball section of the sole can be separated from the heel so that both are connected to the upper part of the shoe without being directly connected to each other, or the bridging element can reach as far as the ball section and overlaps with approximately one third of this.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/14; A43B 5/16; A43B 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/12 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938404A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801638 U1 19980520; EP 0971605 A1 20000119; EP 0971605 B1 20030611; US 6233846 B1 20010522; WO 9938404 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905911 P 20030717

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT