Global Patent Index - EP 0971605 B1

EP 0971605 B1 2003-06-11 - SHOE, ESPECIALLY SPORTS OR DANCING SHOE

Title (en)

SHOE, ESPECIALLY SPORTS OR DANCING SHOE

Title (de)

SCHUH, INSBESONDERE SPORT- ODER TANZSCHUH

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE, NOTAMMENT CHAUSSURE DE SPORT OU DE DANSE

Publication

EP 0971605 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906213 A

Priority

  • DE 29801638 U
  • EP 9900621 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938404A1] The invention relates to a shoe having a sole (10) which comprises an area for the balls of the feet (14) and a heel (12). The heel (12) has an open central area below the heel of the foot which area is bridged by a bridge element (16). The bridge element (16) is stiff. The open central area of the heel (12) can extend as far as the front edge of the heel (12) to make it U- or C-shaped. The edge area of the bridge element can overlap with the inside edge of the heel (12). The area of the sole (10) below the balls of the feet (14) can be separate from the heel (12) so that both are connected to the upper part of the shoe without having direct contact with each other. Alternatively, the bridge element (16) can extend as far as the area of the balls of the feet (14) and overlap with approximately one third of same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/14; A43B 5/16; A43B 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/12 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 13/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801638 U1 19980520; EP 0971605 A1 20000119; EP 0971605 B1 20030611; US 6233846 B1 20010522; WO 9938404 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905911 P 20030717

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT