Global patent index - EP 0971606 A1

EP 0971606 A1 2000-01-19 - CIRCUIT FOR THE PROTECTION OF ELECTRICAL DEVICES

Title (en)

CIRCUIT FOR THE PROTECTION OF ELECTRICAL DEVICES

Title (de)

SCHUHINNENSOHLE

Title (fr)

SEMELLE INTERIEURE DE CHAUSSURE

Publication

EP 0971606 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928235 A

Priority

  • DE 19720142 A
  • DE 19732786 A
  • DE 19801301 A
  • EP 9802706 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7322130B2] The present invention relates to an inner sole for a shoe, comprising a base body, a covering layer and several cushioned layers arranged on the surface of the sole. A first cushioned layer is provided in the ball area of the forefoot, a second cushioned layer is included in the transition area of the metatarsus and the tarsus and a third cushioned area is provided between the metatarsus and the heel. The cushioned layers are subdivided into individual, separate plateau-like fields which are located close to each other in the transversal direction of the sole surface. This provides an inner sole which brings about a substantial improvement in the transport of fluids in the venous and lymphatic vessel system in the legs during movement of the foot joints and ankle joints by means of synergistic support of the muscle structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 17/14; A43B 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/14 (2006.01); A43B 7/22 (2006.01); A43B 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/142 (2013.01); A43B 7/1425 (2013.01); A43B 7/143 (2013.01); A43B 7/1435 (2013.01); A43B 7/144 (2013.01); A43B 7/1445 (2013.01); A43B 7/145 (2013.01); A43B 17/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851178A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 2001039746 A1 20011115; US 7322130 B2 20080129; AT 207713 T 20011115; AU 744650 B2 20020228; AU 8016098 A 19981208; BR 9809624 A 20000704; CA 2284608 A1 19981119; CA 2284608 C 20071127; CN 1202769 C 20050525; CN 1258203 A 20000628; CZ 299291 B6 20080611; CZ 9903972 A3 20000315; DK 0971606 T3 20011119; EP 0971606 A1 20000119; EP 0971606 B1 20011031; ES 2167084 T3 20020501; HK 1028167 A1 20020208; HU 0002945 A2 20010129; HU 0002945 A3 20011228; HU 222428 B1 20030728; JP 2001524855 A 20011204; NO 994957 A 19991012; NO 994957 D0 19991012; PL 187540 B1 20040730; PL 336838 A1 20000717; PT 971606 E 20020429; TR 9902709 T2 20000522; WO 9851178 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20060328

2005-12-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20050508

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020400181

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2167084

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020129

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59801965

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011206

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-11-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991023;LV PAYMENT 19991023;SI PAYMENT 19991023

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 207713

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20011115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-10-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: INNER SOLE FOR A SHOE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991023

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991023;LV PAYMENT 19991023;SI PAYMENT 19991023