Global patent index - EP 0971607 A2

EP 0971607 A2 2000-01-19 - LACE FASTENING SYSTEM

Title (en)

LACE FASTENING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHNÜRVERSCHLUSSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE A LACET

Publication

EP 0971607 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98929208 A

Priority

  • DE 9800996 W
  • DE 19715312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19715312C1] The invention relates to a lace fastening system with at least one device for accommodating the traction elements (4). This device for accommodating the traction elements (4) comprises a pull-in and tightening system, and can be attached to a fastening part (1). The inventive lace fastening system also has guides (2) for the traction elements, said guides being arranged opposite each other on the fastening parts (1) and guiding the traction element (3) in such a way that said traction element (3) is led back and forth alternately between the traction element guides (2) on the fastening parts (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843507A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19715312 C1 19980924; AT 204714 T 20010915; AU 7905698 A 19981022; EP 0971607 A2 20000119; EP 0971607 B1 20010829; WO 9843507 A2 19981008; WO 9843507 A3 19981230

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010829

2002-01-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-08-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 204714

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20010915

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-09-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-08-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991101

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI SE