Global Patent Index - EP 0971614 A1

EP 0971614 A1 2000-01-19 - INTERGRATED SIDERAIL AND ACCESSORY RAIL FOR A BED

Title (en)

INTERGRATED SIDERAIL AND ACCESSORY RAIL FOR A BED

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTES SEITENGITTER UND ZUBEHÖRTRAGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN BETT

Title (fr)

BARREAU LATERAL INTEGRE ET BARRE A ACCESSOIRES POUR LIT

Publication

EP 0971614 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97911888 A

Priority

  • US 9719177 W
  • US 73551096 A
  • US 74731896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817153A1] A rail apparatus (20) is configured to be mounted to a frame (14) of a bed (10). The apparatus (20) includes a siderail (36), a support (38) having a first end (46) pivotably coupled to the siderail (36) and a second end, and a bottom mounting (22, 42) pivotably coupled to the second end of the support (38). The bottom mounting (22, 42) includes at least one mounting bracket (24) for coupling the bottom mounting (22, 42) to the frame (14) of the bed (10), and an accessory rail (26) configured to permit mounting of accessory items (60) on the rail apparatus (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/08 (2006.01); A61G 7/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/0507 (2013.01); A61G 7/05 (2013.01); A61G 7/0509 (2016.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817153 A1 19980430; AT 256986 T 20040115; AT 293421 T 20050515; DE 69727080 D1 20040205; DE 69727080 T2 20040609; DE 69733095 D1 20050525; DE 69733095 T2 20050901; EP 0971614 A1 20000119; EP 0971614 A4 20000517; EP 0971614 B1 20040102; EP 1295583 A2 20030326; EP 1295583 A3 20031022; EP 1295583 B1 20050420

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69727080 P 20040205

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-01-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HILL-ROM SERVICES, INC.

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020411

2000-05-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 21/00 A, 7A 61G 7/05 B, 7A 47C 21/08 B

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CORBIN, SCOTT, M.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOSTER, JEFFREY, A.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILSON, ROBERT, W.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MILLER, JOHN, D.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEBSTER, THOMAS, MATTHEW

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WALKE, JAMES, L.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWELL, CHARLES, A.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990521

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL