Global patent index - EP 0971675 A1

EP 0971675 A1 2000-01-19 - HOLDING AND CATCHING DEVICE

Title (en)

HOLDING AND CATCHING DEVICE

Title (de)

ASSERVATIONS- UND AUFFANGVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONSERVATION ET RECEPTEUR

Publication

EP 0971675 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98913743 A

Priority

  • DE 29705784 U
  • EP 9801872 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843593A1] The invention relates to a holding and catching device (100) for catching the stream of vomit of a vomiting person, comprising a vomit bag (1) or a similar catching receptacle consisting of a flexible and/or folding material, said catching receptacle being closed apart from an opening for catching the vomit, and a catching receptacle stiffening or reinforcing element which holds the edge of the catching receptacle opening in place in during use. In order to provide a holding and catching device (100) of the above-mentioned type which is economical to produce and compact, as well as easy and quick to use for somebody suffering from sickness, and which catches the stream of vomit fully and securely without soiling the user or his/her environment, the invention provides that the catching receptacle stiffening or reinforcing element (2) has at least two stiffening or reinforcing parts (3) which are interconnected in such a way that they can move. These stiffening or reinforcing parts (3) can be unfolded or pulled out of the ready position into the catching position in which the catching section of the catching opening is released.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843593A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29705784 U1 19970522; EP 0971675 A1 20000119; EP 0971675 B1 20020911; WO 9843593 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805515

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100909

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 08

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-09-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050928

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59805515

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021017

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020411

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991023

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL