Global patent index - EP 0971685 A1

EP 0971685 A1 2000-01-19 - COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION FORMING, ON A KERATIN SUBSTRATE, A FILM IN CROSS-LINKED HYBRID MATERIAL

Title (en)

COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITION FORMING, ON A KERATIN SUBSTRATE, A FILM IN CROSS-LINKED HYBRID MATERIAL

Title (de)

KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOlOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, AUF EINEM KERATINISCHEN SUBsTRAT EINEN ÜBERZUG AUS EINEM VERNETZTEN HYBRIDMATERIAL BILDEND

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE FORMANT, SUR UN SUBSTRAT KERATINIQUE, UN REVETEMENT EN UN MATERIAU HYBRIDE RETICULE

Publication

EP 0971685 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98917304 A

Priority

  • FR 9800682 W
  • FR 9704157 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844906A1] The invention concerns a cosmetic or dermatological composition designed for forming a film, on a keratin substrate, in cross-linked hybrid material. Said composition is of the sol/gel type and is obtained by mixing: (a) at least an organometallic compound; (b) at least a functionalised organic polymer or said polymer precursor, or at least a functionalised silicone polymer or said polymer precursor, the latter precursor being different from (a); (c) a sufficient amount of water for hydrolysing the organometallic compound; and (d) optionally at least an alcohol; said film being non-reversible.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 7/00; A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/03 (2006.01); A61K 8/19 (2006.01); A61K 8/24 (2006.01); A61K 8/25 (2006.01); A61K 8/26 (2006.01); A61K 8/29 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/362 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/58 (2006.01); A61K 8/65 (2006.01); A61K 8/66 (2006.01); A61K 8/81 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/893 (2006.01); A61Q 1/00 (2006.01); A61Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61Q 1/10 (2006.01); A61Q 3/00 (2006.01); A61Q 3/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/06 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01); A61Q 17/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01); C08L 83/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/891 (2013.01); A61K 8/042 (2013.01); A61K 8/58 (2013.01); A61K 8/585 (2013.01); A61K 8/8147 (2013.01); A61K 8/817 (2013.01); A61Q 1/02 (2013.01); A61Q 1/10 (2013.01); A61Q 3/02 (2013.01); A61Q 5/06 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61Q 19/08 (2013.01); A61K 2800/95 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844906A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844906 A1 19981015; AU 7055398 A 19981030; AU 717355 B2 20000323; AU 717355 C 20011220; BR 9808454 A 20000523; CA 2284904 A1 19981015; CN 1251519 A 20000426; EP 0971685 A1 20000119; HU 0002337 A2 20001228; IL 132108 D0 20010319; JP 2000510167 A 20000808; JP 4006028 B2 20071114; PL 336001 A1 20000605; RU 2179842 C2 20020227; US 6352699 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/04 20060101AFI20081209BHEP

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/58 20060101ALI20081209BHEP

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/81 20060101ALI20081209BHEP

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/891 20060101ALI20081209BHEP

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61Q 1/02 20060101ALI20081209BHEP

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61Q 3/02 20060101ALI20081209BHEP

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61Q 5/06 20060101ALI20081209BHEP

2009-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61Q 19/00 20060101ALI20081209BHEP

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030924

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990921

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE