Global Patent Index - EP 0971734 A4

EP 0971734 A4 2001-02-07 - CARBOHYDRATE ANTIGENS WHICH IMMUNOREACT WITH POLYCLONAL ANTISERA AGAINST H. PYLORI

Title (en)

CARBOHYDRATE ANTIGENS WHICH IMMUNOREACT WITH POLYCLONAL ANTISERA AGAINST H. PYLORI

Title (de)

CARBOHYDRAT-ANTIGENE, WELCHE MIT POLYKLONALEN ANTISEREN GEGEN HELICOBACTER PYLORI REAGIEREN

Title (fr)

ANTIGENES CARBOHYDRATES FAISANT MONTRE D'UNE REACTIVITE IMMUNOLOGIQUE AVEC DES ANTISERUMS POLYCLONAUX A L'ENCONTRE D'H. PYLORI

Publication

EP 0971734 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98912029 A

Priority

  • US 9805850 W
  • US 4240397 P
  • US 4397697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842372A1] Carbohydrate antigens which immunoreact with H. pylori carbohydrate specific polyconal antisera. Such antigens are produced by DNA contained in ATCC Deposit No. 98373. Such antigens are capable of inducing an immune response against H. pylori.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/02; C12N 15/00; C12P 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/205 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12P 19/04 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/205 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9638475 A1 19961205 - ASTRA AB [SE], et al
  • [X] R. SHERBURNE ET AL.: "Helicobacter pylori expresses a complex surface carbohydrate, Lewis X.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 63, no. 12, December 1995 (1995-12-01), USA, pages 4564 - 4568, XP002914025
  • [A] A. MORAN: "Cell surface characteristics of Helicobacter pylori.", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 10, February 1995 (1995-02-01), pages 271 - 280, XP000612197
  • See also references of WO 9842372A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842372 A1 19981001; AU 6584298 A 19981020; CA 2284671 A1 19981001; EP 0971734 A1 20000119; EP 0971734 A4 20010207; JP 2001520671 A 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990927

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE