Global Patent Index - EP 0971792 A2

EP 0971792 A2 2000-01-19 - NOZZLE, APPLICATION FOR A NOZZLE AND METHOD FOR INJECTING A FIRST FLUID INTO A SECOND FLUID

Title (en)

NOZZLE, APPLICATION FOR A NOZZLE AND METHOD FOR INJECTING A FIRST FLUID INTO A SECOND FLUID

Title (de)

DÜSE, VERWENDUNG EINER DÜSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINDÜSUNG EINES ERSTEN FLUIDS IN EIN ZWEITES FLUID

Title (fr)

AJUTAGE, UTILISATION D'UN AJUTAGE ET PROCEDE POUR INJECTER UN PREMIER FLUIDE DANS UN DEUXIEME FLUIDE

Publication

EP 0971792 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98925398 A

Priority

  • DE 9800778 W
  • DE 19713377 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19713377A1] The invention relates to a nozzle (1) for injecting a first fluid (10), especially fuel, into a second fluid (11), especially combustion air. The first fluid (10) is guided by two channels (3, 4) in the nozzle, one of said channels (4) flowing eccentrically into the other channel (3) so as to produce a swirled main flow (10c) which is then able to penetrate far into the second fluid (11). The swirl causes the injected, first fluid (10) to fan out, and thus become finely divided. The invention also relates to an application for a nozzle of this type (1) in a premix burner of a gas turbine, and to a corresponding method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/28 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01); F23D 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/3478 (2013.01); B05B 1/3421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843743A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19713377 A1 19981015; EP 0971792 A2 20000119; EP 0971792 B1 20021106; JP 2001521438 A 20011106; WO 9843743 A2 19981008; WO 9843743 A3 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070316

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070316

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070316

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806190 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI