Global patent index - EP 0971799 A1

EP 0971799 A1 2000-01-19 - A METHOD FOR CREATING A PLANAR ALUMINUM LAYER IN A FLAT PANEL DISPLAY STRUCTURE

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR CREATING A PLANAR ALUMINUM LAYER IN A FLAT PANEL DISPLAY STRUCTURE

Title (de)

VERFAHRN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PLANAREN ALUMINIUMSCHICHT IN EINEM FLACHBILDSCHIRM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CREATION D'UNE COUCHE PLANE D'ALUMINIUM DANS UNE STRUCTURE D'AFFICHAGE A PANNEAU PLAT

Publication

EP 0971799 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98903607 A

Priority

  • US 9801091 W
  • US 80833697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837983A1] On a flat panel display structure, having a raised black matrix (200) defining wells within the matrix, is deposited a non-conformal, planar layer of acrylic-containing aluminizing lacquer (208) over a layer of phosphors (206) residing within the wells of the black matrix. A planar layer of catalyst material (210) is deposited over the layer of lacquer (208). A planar aluminum layer (212) is subsequently deposited over the catalytic layer (210). Finally, a baking process is conducted at a temperature such that the lacquer layer (208) and the catalyst layer (210) are cleanly and completely evaporated. This temperature is relatively low so as not to adversely affect the reflectivity of the aluminum layer (212), damage the black matrix material (200), or induce oxidation of phosphors. A substantially planar and mirror-like aluminum surface is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/22 (2006.01); H01J 29/28 (2006.01); H01J 29/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/327 (2013.01); H01J 29/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9837983A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837983 A1 19980903; DE 69818239 D1 20031023; DE 69818239 T2 20040701; EP 0971799 A1 20000119; EP 0971799 A4 20000517; EP 0971799 B1 20030917; JP 2001504267 A 20010327; JP 3483577 B2 20040106; KR 20000070743 A 20001125; US 6126988 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69818239

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69818239

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-06-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69818239

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031023

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-21 [111L] LICENCES

- Free Format Text: 20010911 0100 CANDESCENT TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANDESCENT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DRUMM, PAUL, M.

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 05D 3/02 A, 7H 01J 29/28 B

2000-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DRUMM, PAUL, M.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990928

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB