Global patent index - EP 0971805 A1

EP 0971805 A1 2000-01-19 - METHOD AND CASTING DEVICE FOR PRECISION CASTING

Title (en)

METHOD AND CASTING DEVICE FOR PRECISION CASTING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GIESSEINRICHTUNG FÜR FEINGUSS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MOULAGE D'OBJETS PAR COULEE DE PRECISION

Publication

EP 0971805 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98906787 A

Priority

  • CH 9800103 W
  • CH 76597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845071A1] The invention relates to a gas exchange method used for producing precision casting objects. A melting pot (1) and a casting mold (2) with at least partially porous walls are placed in a gas-tight container (5). The casting mold (2) with the cast cavity (3) is evacuated before the pouring-in process and then washed with a light gas, such as helium. After the cast cavity (3) has been filled, a second, heavy gas, such as argon is applied to the surface (18) of the cast in the casting mold (2) and said surface is exposed to an excess pressure, thereby improving the filling degree of the cast cavity (3) and the structure of the cast objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 18/06; B22D 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/06 (2006.01); B22D 23/00 (2006.01); B22D 27/00 (2006.01); B22D 27/13 (2006.01); B22D 27/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/003 (2013.01); B22D 18/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845071A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845071 A1 19981015; CN 1072071 C 20011003; CN 1251543 A 20000426; DE 59802238 D1 20020110; EP 0971805 A1 20000119; EP 0971805 B1 20011128; EP 0971805 B2 20090603; JP 2001518847 A 20011016; JP 4275195 B2 20090610; US 6253828 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120317

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-08-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59802238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100317

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2009-06-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2009-03-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: REITER, CHRISTIAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-12-31 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Owner name: CHRISTIAN REITER

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUEA

2006-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: YASUI, SHOUZUI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: REITER, CHRISTIAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-10-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHULTHEISS GMBH

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WERNER BRUDERER PATENTANWALT

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-10

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-08-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-02-25 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITCL

- Representative's name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREVETTUALE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990928

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI