Global Patent Index - EP 0971820 A1

EP 0971820 A1 2000-01-19 - AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE

Title (en)

AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE

Title (de)

GELDAUTOMAT

Title (fr)

GUICHET BANCAIRE AUTOMATIQUE

Publication

EP 0971820 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97950895 A

Priority

  • US 9722511 W
  • US 3150196 P
  • US 82756797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9823448A1] A receipt form handling system for an automated banking machine includes a printer (30) which prints indicia on paper extending in a paper path (151). Paper is moved in the paper path by engagement with a drive mechanism (157, 159). Paper sheets are delivered by the drive mechanism to a delivery area, which includes a nip (114) of a sheet transport (26). The transport removes the sheets from the delivery area. A cutter (153) is positioned in the paper path and operates to selectively cut the paper. A sensor (155) is positioned at a location in the paper path upstream from the cutter. A controller (112) is in operative connection with the sensor and the cutter. The controller operates the cutter so that the paper is cut to produce a form sheet after indicia is printed on a portion of the paper. Upon the sensor detecting an approaching end of the paper, the controller ceases operation of the cutter. This avoids producing forms that are of insufficient length to be handled by the drive or transport.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/70; B41J 11/46; B65H 29/58; G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/46 (2006.01); B41J 11/66 (2006.01); B41J 11/70 (2006.01); B65H 29/58 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01); G07G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); B41J 11/46 (2013.01); B41J 11/663 (2013.01); B41J 11/666 (2013.01); B41J 11/70 (2013.01); B65H 29/58 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07G 5/00 (2013.01); B65H 2513/41 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2513/41 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9823448 A1 19980604; BR 9714889 A 20001017; CA 2271050 A1 19980604; CA 2271050 C 20050503; DE 69730998 D1 20041104; EP 0971820 A1 20000119; EP 0971820 A4 20000119; EP 0971820 B1 20040929; ES 2229396 T3 20050416

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101125

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101125

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69730998

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101125

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229396 T3

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730998 P 20041104

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE

2004-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEBOLD SST HOLDING COMPANY, INC.

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEBOLD HOLDING COMPANY, INC.

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MASON, THOMAS, S.

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRANNAN, JEFFREY, A.

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOOVER, TIMOTHY, R.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990604

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT