Global patent index - EP 0971851 A1

EP 0971851 A1 2000-01-19 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ELECTROSTATIC CHARGING

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ELECTROSTATIC CHARGING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ELEKTROSTATISCHEN AUFLADEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN CHARGE ELECTROSTATIQUE

Publication

EP 0971851 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98917100 A

Priority

  • DE 19713662 A
  • EP 9801855 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19713662A1] The invention relates to a method for electrostatically charging the two surfaces of at least one web with a charge of opposite polarity, before this at least one web is processed further. According to the invention, the web is fed through the gap between a pair of rollers, said rollers being positioned parallel with each other and a short distance apart from each other. The invention is characterised in that the two surfaces of the at least one web are electrostatically charged by means of rollers in the gap between said rollers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 27/00; B41F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/00 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5132 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1451 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843905A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19713662 A1 19981008; AT 210593 T 20011215; AT 222210 T 20020815; AU 5322498 A 19981022; AU 7042598 A 19981022; AU 736011 B2 20010726; DE 29723999 U1 19991209; DE 59707978 D1 20020919; DE 59802440 D1 20020124; DK 0971851 T3 20020408; EP 0923500 A1 19990623; EP 0923500 B1 20020814; EP 0971851 A1 20000119; EP 0971851 B1 20011212; ES 2169509 T3 20020701; ES 2181044 T3 20030216; JP 2000505032 A 20000425; JP 2000509697 A 20000802; JP 3258034 B2 20020218; JP 3284503 B2 20020520; US 6159555 A 20001212; US 6445562 B1 20020903; WO 9843904 A1 19981008; WO 9843905 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-01 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2006-05-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050915

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-03-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050915

2006-03-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20050915

2006-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-01-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GMBH

2005-08-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050826

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SPENGLER ELECTRONIC AG

2005-06-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SPENGLER ELECTRONIC AG

- Effective date: 20020910

2005-04-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050303

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-03-01 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050301

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-04-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040407

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-09-17 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR ELECTROSTATIC CHARGING

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SPENGLER ELECTRONIC AG

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SPENGLER ELECTRONIC AG

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2169509

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59802440

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020124

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 210593

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20011215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-11-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR ELECTROSTATIC CHARGING

2000-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR ELECTROSTATIC CHARGING

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990909

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE