Global patent index - EP 0971853 A1

EP 0971853 A1 2000-01-19 - APPARATUS FOR STACKING FLEXIBLE SHEET-LIKE PRODUCTS, SUCH AS INDUSTRIAL HIDES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR STACKING FLEXIBLE SHEET-LIKE PRODUCTS, SUCH AS INDUSTRIAL HIDES

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM STAPELN VON FLEXIBLEN BOGENFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTE, SOWIE INDUSTRIELLE HÄUTEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DESTINE A EMPILER DES PRODUITS DU TYPE FEUILLE FLEXIBLE, TELS QUE LES FEUILLES BRUTES INDUSTRIELLES

Publication

EP 0971853 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912703 A

Priority

  • IT 9800068 W
  • IT VR970026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843906A1] An apparatus for stacking flexible sheet-like products, such as industrial hides and similar objects, comprises a bearing frame (2) which supports a first movable surface (3) for the advancement of the products along a generally inclined direction (V), and a second movable surface (4) arranged at least partially under the first surface (3) for handling and unloading the products (P) on a gathering support (C, T). The second movable surface (4) is slidingly mounted on a carriage (7) vertically movable from a minimum height from the ground, while the first movable surface (3) is oscillably mounted on said frame structure (11) with its downward end connected to said carriage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/62 (2013.01); B65H 29/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843906A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843906 A1 19981008; AU 6746198 A 19981022; DE 69801652 D1 20011018; EP 0971853 A1 20000119; EP 0971853 B1 20010912; IT 1305902 B1 20010521; IT VR970026 A1 19980928; IT VR970026 D0 19970328

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-03-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-12-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69801652

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-18

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2001-09-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-09-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT