Global patent index - EP 0971926 A1

EP 0971926 A1 2000-01-19 - DIHYDROPYRAZINO 1,2-(A)- INDOLE-1-ONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN THERAPEUTICS

Title (en)

DIHYDROPYRAZINO 1,2-(A)- INDOLE-1-ONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN THERAPEUTICS

Title (de)

DIHYDROPYRAZINO¬1,2-A INDOL-1-ONDERIVATE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE DIHYDROPYRAZINO 1,2-(A) INDOLE-1-ONE, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION EN THERAPEUTIQUE

Publication

EP 0971926 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98914929 A

Priority

  • FR 9800529 W
  • FR 9703389 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2761070A1] The invention concerns compounds of formula (I) in which R1 and R2 represent hydrogen, halogen, -NH2, -OH, -NO2, -CN, (C1-C6)alkyl, (C1-C6)alkoxy, -CF3, -OCF3, -COOH, -COOR4; -CONH2, -CONHR4, -CONR4R5, -SR4, -SO2R4, -NHCOR4, -NHSO2R4, -N(R4)2, (R4 and R5 represent (C1-C4)alkyl); R3 represents hydrogen, (C1-C6)alkyl, -(CH2)pOH, -(CH2)nCH(OH) (CH2)nOH, -(CH2)pNH2, -(CH2)pNHR7; (R7 = -C (=NH)-NH2), -(CH2)pNH2, -(CH2)nCOOH, -(CH2)nCOOR4, -(CH2)nCN, -(CH2)n-tetrazol-5-yl, (a) (G = -CH2-, -CH(OH)- or -NH-), -(CH2)nCONHR8 (R8 = -OH, (C1-C4) alkoxy or 1-methylpiperidin-4-yl), -(CH2)nCONH(CH2)nR9 (R9 = hydroxy or -NR4R5), (CH2)nCONAA (AA = amino acid), -(CH2)nCONH2, -(CH2)pSH, -(CH2)nSO3H, -(CH2)nSO2NH2, -(CH2)nSO2NHR4, -(CH2)nSO2NR4R5, -(CH2)nCONHR4, -(CH2)nCONR4R5, -(CH2)pNHSO2R4, -(CH2)pNHCOR4, -(CH2)pOCOR4 (n = 1 to 4 and p = 2 to 4), Q represents two hydrogen atoms or an oxygen atom, Z is -N- or -CH-, A is (1) or (2) (b) B being nitrogen, oxygen, sulphur, -NH or -NR4 and R6 identical to R1 and R2 but independent. The compounds have serotonin antagonist properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 487/04; A61K 31/495

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842710A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2761070 A1 19980925; FR 2761070 B1 19990423; AR 012095 A1 20000927; AU 6924098 A 19981020; EP 0971926 A1 20000119; WO 9842710 A1 19981001; ZA 9802369 B 19980923

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DIHYDROPYRAZINO 1,2-(A)- INDOLE-1-ONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN THERAPEUTICS

2003-04-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020517

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DIHYDROPYRAZINO 1,2-(A)-)INDOLE-1-ONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN THERAPEUTICS

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE