Global Patent Index - EP 0971997 A1

EP 0971997 A1 2000-01-19 - HARD-SURFACE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

HARD-SURFACE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR HARTE OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE DE SURFACES DURES

Publication

EP 0971997 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912446 A

Priority

  • EP 9801273 W
  • GB 9704989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840452A1] The invention provides a hard surface cleaning composition of pH 3-11 comprising: a) 1-30 % nonionic surfactant, b) 0.005-5 % of a water soluble, anionic polymer having an average molecular weight of less than 1000000, said polymer being free of quaternary nitrogen groups, wherein, the ratio of polymer: nonionic is 0.1: 1 or less, and, c) 0.005-5 % of a cationic surfactant. It is believed that in the presence of the cationic surfactant, negatively charged (i.e. carboxylic dissociated) polymer can interact with the cationic surfactant and the nonionic surfactant to form a three-component complex which deposit the nonionic surfactant upon the soil and/or surface being cleaned. While the mechanism is not entirely clear, this may possibly be due to the interaction of the charged polymer with mixed miscelles of cationic and nonionic surfactant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/835; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840452A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840452 A1 19980917; AU 6728098 A 19980929; AU 734919 B2 20010628; BR 9808003 A 20000308; CA 2280877 A1 19980917; CN 1250470 A 20000412; DE 69816603 D1 20030828; DE 69816603 T2 20040609; EP 0971997 A1 20000119; EP 0971997 B1 20030723; ES 2202825 T3 20040401; GB 9704989 D0 19970430; HU 0001503 A2 20000928; HU 0001503 A3 20030228; ID 22433 A 19991014; IN 190010 B 20030531; JP 2001514693 A 20010911; KR 20000076119 A 20001226; MY 120141 A 20050930; PL 187303 B1 20040630; PL 335609 A1 20000508; TR 9902201 T2 20000522; ZA 9801574 B 19990825

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070224

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070226

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070226

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070224

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070224

2006-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202825 T3

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816603 P 20030828

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAS, JULIE, ROSALYN,UNILEVER RES. PORT SUNLIGHT

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RABONE, KENNETH, L.,UNILEVER RES. PORT SUNLIGHT

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHARPLES, MARTIN,UNILEVER RES. PORT SUNLIGHT LAB

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020724

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990817

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT