Global patent index - EP 0972000 A1

EP 0972000 A1 2000-01-19 - A SELECTED CRYSTALLINE CALCIUM CARBONATE BUILDER FOR USE IN DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

A SELECTED CRYSTALLINE CALCIUM CARBONATE BUILDER FOR USE IN DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

ZUR VERWENDUNG IN WASCHMITTELN GEEIGNETER KRISTALLINER CALCIUMCARBONATBUILDER

Title (fr)

ADJUVANT AU CARBONATE DE CALCIUM CRISTALLIN SELECTIONNE UTILISE DANS DES COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES

Publication

EP 0972000 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98909018 A

Priority

  • US 9804469 W
  • US 3668097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840455A1] A detergent composition containing an inexpensive detergent builder in the form of a selected crystalline calcium carbonate is provided. Specifically, the crystalline calcium carbonate has a substantially rhombohedral crystal structure with {1,0,-1,1} crystallographic indices. The crystalline calcium carbonate can be calcite that has been specially modified to a rhombohedral crystal structure with {1,0,-1,1} indices. The crystalline calcium carbonate of the present invention is extremely inexpensive because it can be readily formed from inexpensive naturally occurring calcite, and it performs well even when used at large median particle sizes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01F 11/18 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1233 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840455A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840455 A1 19980917; BR 9808237 A 20000516; CN 1254366 A 20000524; EP 0972000 A1 20000119; JP 2001514698 A 20010911

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025120

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040508

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031028

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990927

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE