Global Patent Index - EP 0972007 A1

EP 0972007 A1 2000-01-19 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES

Publication

EP 0972007 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917084 A

Priority

  • EP 9801770 W
  • GB 9706083 A
  • GB 9722345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842817A1] Detergent compositions in the form of tablets for fabric washing contain, at least 30 % but preferably not over 56 % of particles which contain most or all of the non-soap surfactant so that this provides from 20-50 % of these particles, which also contain water soluble detergency builder. The non-soap surfactant is a mixture of anionic and non-ionic surfactants where the amount of anionic surfactant is at least 1.5 times the amount of non-ionic surfactant. These particles are accompanied by at least 15 % of material which is other than soap or organic surfactant and which promotes rapid dissolution and disintegration of the tablet composition. The preferred material is sodium tripolyphosphate containing a majority of the phase (I) anhydrous form, and partially hydrated so as to contain from 1-4 % by weight of water of hydration. The particles form a network which gives both strength and elasticity to the tablet prior to use, while the water soluble material accompanying the particles, promotes rapid dissolution and disintegration at the time of use, thus giving an improved combination of strength when handled, resistance to breakage in transit, and speed of disintegration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842817A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842817 A1 19981001; AU 7041898 A 19981020; AU 742565 B2 20020110; BR 9808057 A 20000308; CA 2284828 A1 19981001; CN 1257536 A 20000621; DE 69824564 D1 20040722; DE 69824564 T2 20050609; EP 0972007 A1 20000119; EP 0972007 B1 20040616; ES 2222583 T3 20050201; PL 335883 A1 20000522; TR 9902317 T2 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110319

2012-04-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110318

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110318

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070318

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-05-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060502

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222583 T3

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824564 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

2004-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990913