Global Patent Index - EP 0972009 A1

EP 0972009 A1 2000-01-19 - LAVATORY CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

LAVATORY CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

TOILETTENREINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE POUR W.C.

Publication

EP 0972009 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912449 A

Priority

  • EP 9801289 W
  • GB 9705346 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9841608A1] A slow-release lavatory cleansing block comprising: a) a bleaching agent or precursor therefor, b) an oily liquid perfume, and c) a water-insoluble, gelling polymer derived from one or more ethylenically unsaturated carboxyl group-containing monomers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/18 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0056 (2013.01); C11D 1/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/18 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 3/3955 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841608A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9841608 A1 19980924; AR 011966 A1 20000913; AU 6728398 A 19981012; AU 725381 B2 20001012; BR 9808021 A 20000308; CA 2282295 A1 19980924; CA 2282295 C 20080108; DE 69806234 D1 20020801; DE 69806234 T2 20021107; EP 0972009 A1 20000119; EP 0972009 B1 20020626; ES 2176992 T3 20021201; GB 9705346 D0 19970430; HU 0001500 A2 20000928; HU 0001500 A3 20030228; HU 226080 B1 20080428; PL 186733 B1 20040227; PL 335638 A1 20000508; ZA 9802101 B 19990913

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130302

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120303

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69806234

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176992 T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806234 20020801

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990908

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL