Global patent index - EP 0972011 A1

EP 0972011 A1 2000-01-19 - CYCLIN-DEPENDENT PROTEIN KINASE

Title (en)

CYCLIN-DEPENDENT PROTEIN KINASE

Title (de)

CYCLIN-ABHÄNGIGE PROTEINKINASE

Title (fr)

PROTEINE KINASE CYCLINO-DEPENDANTE

Publication

EP 0972011 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906202 A

Priority

  • GB 9707491 A
  • US 9802337 W
  • US 3785597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835015A1] An isolated nucleic acid molecule is disclosed which encodes a novel human cyclin-dependent kinase (CDK) which comprises a novel cyclin binding domain signature sequence and lacks several heretofore conserved amino acid residues involved in regulation of the cdk/cyclin complex. Associated proteins and biologically active mutant forms are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/00; C07K 16/40; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/12; C12N 15/54; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1205 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] DATABASE EMBL [Online] EBI; 1 July 1995 (1995-07-01) Database accession no. H17727 XP002229224
  • [Y] MEYERSON M ET AL: "A family of human cdc2-related protein kinases" EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 11, no. 8, 1992, pages 2909-2917, XP002128265 ISSN: 0261-4189 -& DATABASE EMBL [Online] EBI; 3 May 1993 (1993-05-03) Database accession no. x66362 XP002229247 -& DATABASE EMBL [Online] EBI; 15 June 1992 (1992-06-15) Database accession no. x66357 XP002229248
  • [Y] GRANA X ET AL: "PITALRE, A NUCLEAR CDC2-RELATED PROTEIN KINASE THAT PHOSPHORYLATES THE RETINOBLASTOMA PROTEIN IN VITRO" PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 91, April 1994 (1994-04), pages 3834-3838, XP000919000 ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [A] DATABASE SWISS-PROT [Online] EBI; 1 April 1993 (1993-04-01) Database accession no. P29620 XP002229225 -& HATA S.: "complementary DNA cloning of a novel CDC2-positive -CDC28-related protein kinase from rice" FEBS (FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOECHEMICAL SOCIETIES) LETTERS, vol. 279, no. 1, 1991, pages 149-152, XP002229244
  • See also references of WO 9835015A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835015 A1 19980813; CA 2280206 A1 19980813; EP 0972011 A1 20000119; EP 0972011 A4 20030416; JP 2001511015 A 20010807

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE