Global Patent Index - EP 0972045 A1

EP 0972045 A1 2000-01-19 - NUCLEIC ACID FRAGMENTS AND POLYPEPTIDE FRAGMENTS DERIVED FROM $i(M. TUBERCULOSIS)

Title (en)

NUCLEIC ACID FRAGMENTS AND POLYPEPTIDE FRAGMENTS DERIVED FROM $i(M. TUBERCULOSIS)

Title (de)

NUKLEINSÄURE- UND POLYPEPTIDFRAGMENTE VON M. TUBERCULOSIS

Title (fr)

FRAGMENTS D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ET FRAGMENTS POLYPEPTIDIQUES DERIVES DE $i(M. TUBERCULOSIS)

Publication

EP 0972045 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913536 A

Priority

  • DK 9800132 W
  • DK 37697 A
  • DK 127797 A
  • US 4462497 P
  • US 7048898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844119A1] The present invention is based on the identification and characterization of a number of M. tuberculosis derived novel proteins and protein fragments (SEQ ID NOs: 2, 4, 6, 8, 10, 12, 14, 16, 17-23, 42, 48, 50, 52, 54, 56, 58, 60, 62, 64, 66, 68, 70, 72-86, 88, 90, 92, 94, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, and 168-171). The invention is directed to the polypeptides and immunologically active fragments thereof, the genes encoding them, immunological compositions such as vaccines and skin test reagents containing the polypeptides. Another part of the invention is based on the surprising discovery that fusions between ESAT-6 and MPT59 are superior immunogens compared to each of the unfused proteins, respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/31; A61K 38/16; A61K 39/04; C07K 14/35; C07K 16/12; C12N 15/62; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/04 (2006.01); A61K 39/104 (2006.01); A61K 39/112 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/35 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/31 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/35 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/51 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844119A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844119 A1 19981008; AT 370236 T 20070915; AU 6820498 A 19981022; AU 740545 B2 20011108; CA 2285625 A1 19981008; CA 2285625 C 20150630; DE 69838268 D1 20070927; DE 69838268 T2 20080508; DK 1449922 T3 20071203; EP 0972045 A1 20000119; EP 1449922 A2 20040825; EP 1449922 A3 20041117; EP 1449922 B1 20070815; ES 2291810 T3 20080301; JP 2001515359 A 20010918; JP 2008142079 A 20080626; JP 2008301817 A 20081218; JP 2010154856 A 20100715; JP 4172598 B2 20081029; JP 4406024 B2 20100127; JP 4544434 B2 20100915; PT 1449922 E 20071109

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040722

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031010

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERSEN, PETER

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SKJOT, RIKKE

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSENKRANDS, IDA

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WELDINGH, KARIN

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RASMUSSEN, PETER, BIRK

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OETTINGER, THOMAS

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FLORIO, WALTER

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: NUCLEIC ACID FRAGMENTS AND POLYPEPTIDE FRAGMENTS DERIVED FROM M. TUBERCULOSIS

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERSEN, PETER

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SKJOT, RIKKE

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSENKRANDS, IDA

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WELDINGH, KARIN

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RASMUSSEN, PETER, BIRK

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OETTINGER, THOMAS

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FLORIO, WALTER

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991102

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE