Global Patent Index - EP 0972082 A1

EP 0972082 A1 2000-01-19 - CLOSED-LOOP BIOCHEMICAL ANALYZERS

Title (en)

CLOSED-LOOP BIOCHEMICAL ANALYZERS

Title (de)

BIOCHEMISCHE ANALYSATOREN, DIE ALS GESCHLOSSENES SYSTEM ARBEITEN

Title (fr)

ANALYSEURS BIOCHIMIQUES FONCTIONNANT EN BOUCLE FERMEE

Publication

EP 0972082 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914498 A

Priority

  • US 9806723 W
  • US 83510197 A
  • US 6831197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845481A1] Integrated systems, apparatus, software, and methods for performing biochemical analysis, including DNA sequencing, genomic screening, purification of nucleic acids and other biological components and drug screening are provided. Microfluidic devices, systems and methods for using these devices and systems for performing a wide variety of fluid operations are provided. The devices and systems are used in performing fluid operations which require a large number of iterative, successive or parallel fluid manipulations, in a microscale, or sealed and readily automated format.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C12M 1/00; C12N 11/04; C12N 15/00; C12P 19/34; G01N 15/06; G01N 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 19/34 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01N 27/447 (2006.01); B01L 7/00 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/0262 (2013.01); B01L 3/502715 (2013.01); B01L 3/502784 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6869 (2013.01); G01N 21/6428 (2013.01); G01N 27/44791 (2013.01); B01F 13/0059 (2013.01); B01L 3/502753 (2013.01); B01L 7/52 (2013.01); B01L 2200/027 (2013.01); B01L 2200/0605 (2013.01); B01L 2200/0673 (2013.01); B01L 2200/10 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0636 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0816 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0838 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0864 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0867 (2013.01); B01L 2300/18 (2013.01); B01L 2300/1833 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0415 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0418 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0421 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0487 (2013.01); G01N 2035/1053 (2013.01); G01N 2035/1058 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12Q 1/6869 + C12Q 2565/629 + C12Q 2537/143 + C12Q 2535/101
  2. C12Q 1/6869 + C12Q 2565/629 + C12Q 2535/101

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845481 A1 19981015; AU 6884198 A 19981030; AU 746892 B2 20020502; CA 2284612 A1 19981015; EP 0972082 A1 20000119; EP 0972082 A4 20070425; EP 1959255 A2 20080820; EP 1959255 A3 20080924; JP 2001521622 A 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080409

2007-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-04-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070125

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER LIFE SCIENCES, INC.

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER LIFE SCIENCES, INC.

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER LIFE SCIENCE, INC.

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER TECHNOLOGIES, CORP.

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNAPP, MICHAEL

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARCE, JOHN, WALLACE

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOUSSE,LUC J.

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOPF-SILL, ANNE, R.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE