Global patent index - EP 0972085 A1

EP 0972085 A1 2000-01-19 - SENSORS FOR ELECTRICALLY SENSING BINDING EVENTS FOR SUPPORTED MOLECULAR RECEPTORS

Title (en)

SENSORS FOR ELECTRICALLY SENSING BINDING EVENTS FOR SUPPORTED MOLECULAR RECEPTORS

Title (de)

SENSOREN ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN MESSUNG VON BINDUNGSEREIGNISSEN AN GEBUNDENEN MOLEKULAREN REZEPTOREN

Title (fr)

CAPTEURS PERMETTANT DE DETECTER ELECTRIQUEMENT LES PHENOMENES DE LIAISON RELATIFS AUX RECEPTEURS MOLECULAIRES SUR SUPPORT

Publication

EP 0972085 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953322 A

Priority

  • US 9821251 W
  • US 94662097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918242A1] A first sensor (18) for electrically sensing a molecular binding event includes a receptor-supporting element (20) into which a reagent is diffusable, at least one molecular receptor (22) supported by the receptor-supporting element (20), and a first electrode (24) embedded in the receptor-supporting element (20). A second sensor for electrically sensing a molecular binding event includes a receptor-supporting element (130), at least one molecular receptor (132) supported by the receptor-supporting element (130), an electrode (134) coupled to the receptor-supporting element (130), and a porous electrode (136) coupled to the receptor-supporting element (130).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/543 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 27/12 (2006.01); G01N 27/22 (2006.01); G01N 33/559 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/559 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0543550 A1
  • [X] EP 0372911 A2
  • [X] EP 0402917 A2
  • [X] EP 0244207 A1
  • [X] WO 9512808 A1
  • [X] BEATTIE, KENNETH (1) ET AL: "Genosensor technology." CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993) VOL. 39, NO. 4, PP. 719-722. MEETING INFO.: 7TH ANNUAL SAN DIEGO CONFERENCE ON GENETIC RECOGNITION SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA NOVEMBER 18-20, 199 , XP002130664
  • See also references of WO 9918242A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918242 A1 19990415; AU 1072799 A 19990427; AU 717517 B2 20000330; CA 2274245 A1 19990415; CA 2274245 C 20050412; EP 0972085 A1 20000119; EP 0972085 A4 20000426; JP 2001507805 A 20010612; US 6048692 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051011

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7C 12Q 1/68 A, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7G 01N 27/327 B, 7G 01N 33/543 B

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990707;LT PAYMENT 19990707;LV PAYMENT 19990707;RO PAYMENT 19990707;SI PAYMENT 19990707