Global Patent Index - EP 0972099 A1

EP 0972099 A1 2000-01-19 - GRIPPER WEAVING MACHINE

Title (en)

GRIPPER WEAVING MACHINE

Title (de)

GREIFERWEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

METIER A TISSER A RAPIERES

Publication

EP 0972099 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916907 A

Priority

  • DE 19713628 A
  • EP 9801360 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19713628A1] The invention relates to a gripper machine, comprising at least one gripper (1, 2) which is mounted on a gripper strip (3, 4) by means of a guiding part (21), and a line of guide elements (19) arranged one behind the other. Said guide elements can be moved into a shaped weaving shed (22) and have guides for the gripper strip (3) and the guiding part (21). The invention also provides that the guiding part (21) is fitted with at least one sliding rib (26) on the side turned away from the gripper (1), said sliding rib extending in the longitudinal direction of the guiding part (21) and protecting the warp threads (24) from contact with the guiding part (21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/12 (2006.01); D03D 47/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/277 (2013.01); D03D 47/12 (2013.01); D03D 47/23 (2013.01); D03D 47/272 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844180A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19713628 A1 19981008; EP 0972099 A1 20000119; EP 0972099 B1 20030806; US 6230759 B1 20010515; WO 9844180 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120309

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809213

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PICANOL, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PICANOL N.V., IEPER, BE

- Document: DE 59809213

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809213

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PICANOL

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809213

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

- Free text: PICANOL N.V.#TER WAARDE 50#8900 IEPER (BE) -TRANSFER TO- PICANOL N.V.#TER WAARDE 50#8900 IEPER (BE)

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2004-08-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-02-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-11-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809213 P 20030911

2003-08-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *PICANOL N.V.TER WAARDE 50, B-8900 IEPER

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *PICANOL N.V.

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO G. PETSCHNER

2003-08-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990715

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI