Global Patent Index - EP 0972110 A1

EP 0972110 A1 2000-01-19 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH DRY-STRENGTH PAPER, PULPBOARD AND CARDBOARD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH DRY-STRENGTH PAPER, PULPBOARD AND CARDBOARD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPIER, PAPPE UND KARTON MIT HOHER TROCKENFESTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DU PAPIER, DU CARTON-PATE ET DU CARTON A HAUTE RESISTANCE A LA TRACTION A L'ETAT SEC

Publication

EP 0972110 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921399 A

Priority

  • DE 19713755 A
  • EP 9801786 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19713755A1] The invention relates to a method for producing high dry-strength paper, pulpboard and cardboard by adding cationic, anionic and/or amphoteric starch as a dry-strength agent to the paper material, dehydrating the paper material to form sheets in the presence of cationic polymers as starch retention agents, and using cationic polymer retention agents to increase retention of dry-strength agents made from cationic, anionic and/or amphoteric starch during the production of paper, pulpboard and cardboard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/10; D21H 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 17/20 (2006.01); D21H 17/45 (2006.01); D21H 17/55 (2006.01); D21H 17/56 (2006.01); D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 21/18 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 23/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 21/18 (2013.01); D21H 17/29 (2013.01); D21H 17/45 (2013.01); D21H 17/455 (2013.01); D21H 17/55 (2013.01); D21H 17/56 (2013.01); D21H 23/765 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845536A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19713755 A1 19981008; AT 268410 T 20040615; AU 730063 B2 20010222; AU 7427598 A 19981030; CA 2284931 A1 19981015; CA 2284931 C 20100216; EP 0972110 A1 20000119; EP 0972110 B1 20040602; EP 0972110 B2 20090311; ES 2222591 T3 20050201; JP 2001518988 A 20011016; KR 20010006002 A 20010115; NZ 338029 A 20000428; PT 972110 E 20041029; US 6616807 B1 20030909; WO 9845536 A1 19981015; ZA 9802842 B 19990120

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160326

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160326

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160326

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160926

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160327

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160326

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 268410 T

- Effective date: 20160326

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160326

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811513

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-06-09 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2009-06-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-05-06 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070327

2009-03-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2009-03-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070327

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070327

2008-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BASF SE

- Effective date: 20080305

2008-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS AB PATENT DEPARTMENT

2008-03-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BASF SE

2008-02-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS AB PATENT DEPARTMENT

- Effective date: 20050302

2006-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS AB PATENT DEPARTMENT

2005-04-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS ABPATENT DEPARTMENT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222591 T3

2004-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811513 P 20040708

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE