Global patent index - EP 0972124 A1

EP 0972124 A1 2000-01-19 - MODULAR BOLT WITH A HANDLE

Title (en)

MODULAR BOLT WITH A HANDLE

Title (de)

MODULARER STANGENVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

PENE MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 0972124 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928131 A

Priority

  • DE 9800955 W
  • DE 19713518 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844223A1] The invention relates to a bolt with a handle, for doors of switch cupboards, especially thin-walled switch cupboards, comprising a pinion for driving at least one stay bar and an operating element for turning the pinion, the aim of the invention being to make said bolt simpler to assemble and produce. To this end, the pinion (11), and the short locking bars (12) which are driven by the pinion, are mounted and guided in a single flat base body (10) and the short locking bars (12) each have a projection (13) projecting out of this flat body (10) for connecting the at least one stay bar. The flat base body (10) also has a receiving opening (15) for inserting a closing device (17, 18) for use as a bolt with a pivoting lever. The flat base body (10) is designed so that it can be fixed directly on the inside or outside surface of the door leaf as required. An outer jacket (20) for covering the flat base body (10) can be placed on the outer surface of the door leaf and fixed to the flat base body (10) interchangeably.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 13/00; E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/12 (2006.01); E05B 13/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/041 (2013.01); E05B 13/002 (2013.01); E05B 1/0092 (2013.01); E05B 63/0056 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5761 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8865 (2015.04); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04); Y10T 292/82 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844223A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844223 A1 19981008; AT 225451 T 20021015; DK 0972124 T3 20030203; EP 0972124 A1 20000119; EP 0972124 B1 20021002; ES 2184277 T3 20030401; JP 2001521591 A 20011106; US 6363761 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150305

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100403

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100403

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100402

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100402

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100402

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090402

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-12-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-04-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-04-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 09

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2184277

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59805806

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021107

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 225451

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20021015

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020410

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE